Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father José Miguel López Hurtado, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Guapi, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1918Born
8 Dec 193820.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
8 Dec 194123.0Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
16 Mar 194627.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
28 Nov 196951.0AppointedPrefect of Guapi, Colombia
15 Feb 197051.2InstalledPrefect of Guapi, Colombia
10 Jun 198263.5ResignedPrefect of Guapi, Colombia
8 Aug 200990.6DiedPrefect Emeritus of Guapi, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Miguel López Hurtado
Father José Miguel López Hurtado O.F.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Guapi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Rosa de Cabal, Diocese of Manizales

  • a priest for 63.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 7 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 8 Apr 2019

Quantcast