Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Lopez de Lorden

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jan 1455AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
18 Mar 1457AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
13 Jun 1460DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Lopez de Lorden
Bishop Fernando Lopez de Lorden (died ) Bishop of Segovia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 123, and Page 234
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1455, Number 11*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 17 Aug 2018

Quantcast