Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Richard Olivier Cardinal de Longueil

Deceased

Bishop of Coutances, France

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1406Born
28 Sep 145346.7Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances, France
3 Oct 145346.7ConfirmedBishop of Coutances, France
17 Dec 145649.9Elevated to Cardinal
16 Mar 146255.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
17 Aug 147063.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
19 Aug 147063.6DiedBishop of Coutances, France

MicroData Summary for Richard Olivier de Longueil (VIAF: 231985914)
Richard Olivier Cardinal de Longueil (born , died ) Bishop of Coutances

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJonques, Diocese of Lisieux
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 16.8 years
  • a cardinal for 13.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1456
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,337
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1453, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Aug 2018

Quantcast