Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dario de Longhis

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Syros (e Milos)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1701³BornChios
20 Apr 172624.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Sep 173029.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
25 May 173533.8AppointedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
27 Jul 174847.0ResignedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
22 May 175755.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Syros (e Milos), Greece

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Dario de Longhis:
Bishop Dario de Longhis (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Syros (e Milos)

  • a priest for 31.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 383, and Page 390
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015