Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Longchamp

Deceased

Bishop of Ely, England


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Sep 1189³AppointedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
31 Dec 1189Ordained BishopBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
31 Jan 1197DiedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Longchamp:
Bishop William Longchamp (died ) Bishop of Ely

  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 51
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 327

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014