Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Lomellino

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Apr 1562AppointedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
17 Mar 1567AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy
22 Nov 1599DiedBishop of Isernia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Lomellino
Bishop Giovanni Battista Lomellino (died ) Bishop of Isernia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 207, and Page 214
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1562, Number 14*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast