Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Francesco Lombardi, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Izmir (Smirne)

Titular Bishop of Talia


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Aug 1720AppointedVicar Apostolic of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
5 Jul 1721AppointedTitular Bishop of Talia
Dec 1721Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Talia
3 Mar 1722DiedVicar Apostolic of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Pietro Francesco Lombardi
Bishop Pietro Francesco Lombardi O.F.M. Ref. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Izmir (Smirne)

  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 360, and Page 367
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721
  • bp/ob/c2: CB, 20 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 20 Jul 2016