Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal de La Jugié, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1319¹Born
2 Mar 134526.1AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
10 Jan 134728.0AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
27 Aug 137556.6AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
20 Dec 137556.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
20 Dec 137556.9Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 1376³57.8DiedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de La Jugié
Pierre Cardinal de La Jugié O.S.B. (born 1319, died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJugié

  • a cardinal for .9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 356, and Page 426
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 153
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast