Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefan Liu Difen (Liu Daifen, Liu Tifeng)

Deceased

Bishop of Anguo [Ankwo], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1912Born
1939²26.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 198977.3Ordained BishopBishop of Anguo [Ankwo], China
14 Nov 199280.5DiedBishop of Anguo [Ankwo], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefan Liu Difen (Liu Daifen, Liu Tifeng)
Bishop Stefan Liu Difen (Liu Daifen, Liu Tifeng) (born , died ) Bishop of Anguo [Ankwo]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiandukou Village (Renqiu county, Hebei)
Death PlacePrison, Kuangcheng

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Dec 2019
  • b: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast