Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Linwood

Deceased

Bishop of Saint David’s, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jun 1442AppointedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
26 Aug 1442Ordained BishopBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
21 Oct 1446DiedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Linwood:
Bishop William Linwood (died ) Bishop of Saint David’s

  • a bishop for 4.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,460
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 297
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 190
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015