Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Erasmus von Limburg

Deceased

Bishop of Strasbourg, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1507¹Born
9 Dec 154134.9AppointedBishop of Strasbourg, France
21 Apr 154942.3Ordained BishopBishop of Strasbourg, France
27 Nov 156861.9DiedBishop of Strasbourg, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Erasmus von Limburg (VIAF: 7726201)
Bishop Erasmus von Limburg (born 1507, died ) Bishop of Strasbourg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSaverne

  • a bishop for 19.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 117
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1549, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 26 Sep 2017