Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alfonso de Llaño Buelna

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Zamora


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Nov 1657SelectedBishop of Zamora, Spain
18 Mar 1658ConfirmedBishop of Zamora, Spain
19 Oct 1658DiedBishop-Elect of Zamora, Spain

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Alfonso de Llaño Buelna:
Father Alfonso de Llaño Buelna (died ) Bishop-Elect of Zamora

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 245, Number 41
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 376
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015