Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Henri Albert Cardinal de La Grange d’Arquien

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1613Born
12 Dec 169582.2Elevated to Cardinal
11 Apr 169682.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
24 May 170793.7DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere

MicroData Summary for Henri Albert de La Grange d’Arquien
Henri Albert Cardinal de La Grange d’Arquien (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalais, France

  • a cardinal for 11.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1695

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast