Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kazimierz Benedykt Leżeński, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Titular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1656²Born
2 May 169539.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
2 May 169539.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)
17 Sep 169539.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)
25 Oct 170347.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kazimierz Benedykt Leżeński (VIAF: 316495258)
Bishop Kazimierz Benedykt Leżeński O. Cist. (born 1656, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWiślica

  • a bishop for 8.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 221
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,959
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 Jul 2018

Quantcast