Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Johann von Leyen

Deceased

Archbishop-Elect of Trier, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1510¹Born
153222.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Mar 155646.1ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Trier, Germany
12 Jun 155646.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
10 Feb 156757.1DiedArchbishop-Elect of Trier, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann von Leyen (VIAF: 3638203)
Father Johann von Leyen (born 1510, died ) Archbishop-Elect of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAdendorf

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,556
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 317

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast