Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Levingston

Deceased

Bishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Oct 1475AppointedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
30 Jun 1476Ordained BishopBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
30 Aug 1483DiedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Levingston
Bishop James Levingston (died ) Bishop of Dunkeld

EventPlace
Ordained BishopDunkeld, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland

  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 147
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,476, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast