Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alain L’Épervier (Lespervez), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Dec 1437AppointedBishop of Dol, France
24 Aug 1444AppointedBishop of Quimper, France
16 Jan 1451AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina

MicroData Summary for Alain L’Épervier (Lespervez)
Archbishop Alain L’Épervier (Lespervez) O.F.M. , Titular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 145, and Page 136
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 113

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast