Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Leonis

Deceased

Bishop of Curland


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jul 1473AppointedBishop of Curland, Latvia
18 Jul 1473Ordained BishopBishop of Curland, Latvia
31 Jan 1500DiedBishop of Curland, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Martin Leonis:
Bishop Martin Leonis (died ) Bishop of Curland

  • a bishop for 26.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 141
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,527

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013