Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Juan Leiza (de Leyva)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

Titular Bishop of Geras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1700BornAoiz, Spain
1731¹30.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 173938.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
23 Feb 173938.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Geras
24 Oct 174747.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Juan Leiza (de Leyva):
Bishop Francisco Juan Leiza (de Leyva) (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a priest for 16.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 59, Number 267
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 58
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 224, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015