Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gregor Leisentrit

Deceased

Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1550BornOlomouc
157121.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 158636.9SelectedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
Jan 158737.0ConfirmedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
23 May 159444.3DiedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Gregor Leisentrit:
Father Gregor Leisentrit (died ) Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

  • a priest for 23.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015