Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gerhard J. Legeland, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Weetebula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1909Born
6 Apr 193425.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
18 Dec 193728.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
15 Mar 196051.0AppointedPrefect of Weetebula, Indonesia
196959.8ResignedPrefect of Weetebula, Indonesia
4 Apr 198980.1DiedPrefect Emeritus of Weetebula, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Gerhard J. Legeland:
Priest Gerhard J. Legeland C.SS.R. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Weetebula

  • a priest for 51.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1962

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013