Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alberto Lee López, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Guapi, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1927Born
22 Jul 195124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
8 Mar 198557.7AppointedPrefect of Guapi, Colombia
26 May 198557.9InstalledPrefect of Guapi, Colombia
3 Dec 199265.4DiedPrefect of Guapi, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Alberto Lee López
Father Alberto Lee López O.F.M. (born , died ) Prefect of Guapi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Rosa de Cabal, Diocese of Manizales
Death PlaceBogota

  • a priest for 41.3 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 8 Apr 2019

Quantcast