Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Lascaris de Tenda

Deceased

Bishop of Riez, France


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jun 1490AppointedBishop of Riez, France
12 Jan 1523AppointedBishop of Beauvais, France
10 Jan 1530AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
17 Apr 1532AppointedBishop of Riez, France
25 Jul 1546DiedBishop of Riez, France

MicroData Summary for Antonio Lascaris de Tenda
Bishop Antonio Lascaris de Tenda (died ) Bishop of Riez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMane, Diocese of Sisteron

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 222
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 284, and Page 131
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 222
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,490, Number 15*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast