Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Antonio Larrazábal

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Guatemala

Titular Bishop of Comana Armeniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1769Born
9 Feb 179424.5Ordained PriestPriest of Guatemala
8 Jul 183969.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala
8 Jul 183969.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
1 Dec 184677.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Antonio Larrazábal (VIAF: 65554796)
Father Antonio Larrazábal (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Guatemala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Guatemala

  • a priest for 52.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 157
  • bd/ab/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1839, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast