Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Edgar Larochelle, P.M.E. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Société des Missions-Étrangères


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1896Born
29 May 192023.9Ordained PriestPriest
1925²28.5ProfessedPriest of Société des Missions-Étrangères
23 Jul 193741.1AppointedPrefect of Lintong [Lintung], China
11 Jul 193842.1AppointedSuperior General of Société des Missions-Étrangères
19 Feb 195861.7ResignedSuperior General of Société des Missions-Étrangères
21 Jul 196468.1DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Société des Missions-Étrangères

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edgar Larochelle
Father Edgar Larochelle P.M.E. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Société des Missions-Étrangères

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Ferdinand, Archdiocese of Québec, Canada

  • a priest for 44.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 17 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast