Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Lara

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1613BornQuesada
26 Jun 167360.5AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
1 Mar 167562.2AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
23 Oct 167562.8DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Lara:
Archbishop Francisco Lara (died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013