Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Scipione Cardinal Lancellotti

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1527BornRome, Italy
12 Dec 158356.9Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jan 158457.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Simeone Profeta
20 Apr 158760.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro
2 Jun 159871.4DiedCardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro

MicroData Summary for Scipione Lancellotti:
Cardinal Scipione Lancellotti (died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro

  • a cardinal for 14.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1583

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013