Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amalric de la Motte d’Acigné

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Malo


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Feb 1410AppointedBishop of Vannes, France
24 Oct 1432AppointedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
5 Aug 1434DiedBishop of Saint-Malo, France

MicroData Summary for Amalric de la Motte d’Acigné:
Bishop Amalric de la Motte d’Acigné (died ) Bishop of Saint-Malo

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 520
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 182
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,201

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013