Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Laghi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi, China

Titular Bishop of Loryma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1668Born
1704²35.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Chansi and Chensi, China
2 Sep 171547.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi, China
2 Sep 171547.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Loryma
20 Jun 171749.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Loryma
5 Jul 172759.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Laghi
Bishop Antonio Laghi O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastrocaro, Italy

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 247
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast