Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Kupelian

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Attalea in Pamphylia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1820Born
26 Aug 188161.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Attalea in Pamphylia
27 Dec 190080.9DiedTitular Archbishop of Attalea in Pamphylia

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Kupelian
Archbishop Giovanni Kupelian (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Attalea in Pamphylia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiarbekir

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 129
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast