Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Krzyżanowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

Titular Bishop of Saldae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1724³BornOpatowicz
26 Jun 174622.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Feb 174722.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 176238.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
14 Jun 176238.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Saldae

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Krzyżanowski:
Bishop Ignatius Krzyżanowski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 363, and Page 454
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Nov 2015