Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konrad von Krosigk

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Halberstadt


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Sep 1201AppointedBishop of Halberstadt, Germany
1 Jan 1202Ordained BishopBishop of Halberstadt, Germany
1209²ResignedBishop of Halberstadt, Germany
21 Jun 1225³DiedBishop Emeritus of Halberstadt, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Konrad von Krosigk
Bishop Konrad von Krosigk (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Halberstadt

  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 270
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,754
  • ob/c2+: ATh

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 9 Feb 2016