Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ludolf von Kroppenstedt

Deceased

Archbishop of Magdeburg


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Oct 1192AppointedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
16 May 1193Ordained BishopArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
16 Aug 1205DiedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ludolf von Kroppenstedt (VIAF: 86115756)
Archbishop Ludolf von Kroppenstedt (died ) Archbishop of Magdeburg

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 320
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,752
  • ob/c2: ATh

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 9 Feb 2016