Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Łukasz Kościelecki, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1539Born
5 Dec 157536.4AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
1576¹36.4Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
4 Mar 157737.6AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
26 Jul 159758.0DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Łukasz Kościelecki (VIAF: 166699078)
Bishop Łukasz Kościelecki O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Poznań

  • a bishop for 21.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 279
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1576, Number 1*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast