Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Konopacki

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Feb 1509AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
28 Oct 1509Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
23 Apr 1530DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Konopacki
Bishop Jan Konopacki (died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopŁagˇw

  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 182
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,509, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast