Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Inigo Maximilian König, S.D.S. †

Deceased

Prefect of Shaowu [Shaowu], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1904Born
1926²21.4ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Savior
17 Jul 193227.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Savior
21 May 193833.8AppointedPrefect of Shaowu [Shaowu], China
13 Aug 196460.0DiedPrefect of Shaowu [Shaowu], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Inigo Maximilian König
Father Inigo Maximilian König S.D.S. (born , died ) Prefect of Shaowu [Shaowu]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiepoldshofen-Leutkirch, Diocese of Rottenburg, Germany
Death PlaceIlan, Taiwan

  • a priest for 32.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,962
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 12 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast