Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Indunil Janakaratne Kodithuwakku Kankanamalage

Secretary of the Pontifical Council for Interreligious Dialogue

Priest of Badulla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1966 Born
16 Dec 200034.4Ordained PriestPriest of Badulla, Sri Lanka
12 Jun 201649.8AppointedUnder Secretary of the Pontifical Council for Interreligious Dialogue
3 Jul 201952.9AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Interreligious Dialogue

MicroData Summary for Indunil Janakaratne Kodithuwakku Kankanamalage (VIAF: 303243878)
Father Indunil Janakaratne Kodithuwakku Kankanamalage (born ) Secretary of Interreligious Dialogue

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSri Lanka

Please contact the Father through the Pontifical Council for Interreligious Dialogue.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast