Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Winrich von Kniprode

Deceased

Bishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne], Estonia


Events

DateEventTitle
1385¹AppointedBishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne], Estonia
29 May 1385Ordained BishopBishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne], Estonia
5 Nov 1419DiedBishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne], Estonia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Winrich von Kniprode
Bishop Winrich von Kniprode (died ) Bishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopKönigsberg
Death PlaceArensburg

  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 379
  • ob/c2: ATh, 27 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,034

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast