Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Eugène Klaeylé, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Cimbebasia Inferiore, Namibia

Priest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1879Born
1898²18.9First VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
1899²19.9Perpetual VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
21 May 190324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
18 Dec 190930.9AppointedPrefect of Cimbebasia Inferiore, Namibia
10 Jan 192141.9ResignedPrefect of Cimbebasia Inferiore, Namibia
29 Mar 194162.1DiedPrefect Emeritus of Cimbebasia Inferiore, Namibia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eugène Klaeylé
Father Eugène Klaeylé O.M.I. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Cimbebasia Inferiore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMutzig
Death PlaceStrasbourg

  • a priest for 37.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017