Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marek Khuen z Olomouce

Deceased

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Dec 1553SelectedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
22 Apr 1554Ordained BishopBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
10 Feb 1565DiedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Marek Khuen z Olomouce (VIAF: 304956865)
Bishop Marek Khuen z Olomouce (died ) Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopOlomouc, Diocese of Olomouc (Olmütz)

  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,554, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast