Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Wilhelm von Ketteler

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Münster, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1519Born
21 Jul 155334.5SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
29 Nov 155334.9ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
18 Jun 155738.4ResignedBishop-Elect of Münster, Germany
18 May 158263.3DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm von Ketteler
Father Wilhelm von Ketteler (born 1519, died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEggerringhausen

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1553
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018