Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Kennedy

Deceased

Bishop of Killaloe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1786¹Born
23 Jun 183549.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland
23 Jun 183549.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Leuce
17 Jan 183650.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leuce
7 Jun 183650.4SucceededBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
19 Nov 185064.8DiedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Kennedy
Bishop Patrick Kennedy (born 1786, died ) Bishop of Killaloe

  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 231, and Page 238
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1836, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016