Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Aleksandr Kan, S.J.

Superior Emeritus of Kyrgyzstan

Priest of Society of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1963 Born
29 May 198825.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
22 Dec 199734.6AppointedSuperior of Kyrgyzstan
18 Mar 200642.8ResignedSuperior of Kyrgyzstan

MicroData Summary for Aleksandr Kan
Father Aleksandr Kan S.J. (born ) Superior Emeritus of Kyrgyzstan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKaraganda, Kazakhstan

Please contact the Father through the Mission "Sui Iuris" of Kyrgyzstan.

  • a priest for years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018