Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Everard Kalle

Deceased

Bishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Jan 1457SelectedBishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia
16 Mar 1457ConfirmedBishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia
13 Mar 1475DiedBishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia

MicroData Summary for Everard Kalle
Bishop Everard Kalle (died ) Bishop of Reval (Rewel)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 223
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1457, Number 18*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Aug 2018

Quantcast