Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Mieczysław Michailas Joudokas

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Kazan-Samara-Simbirsk, Russian Federation


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1891Born
1914²22.3Ordained PriestPriest of Mohilev, Belarus
1 Sep 192635.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kazan-Samara-Simbirsk, Russian Federation
193846.3DiedApostolic Administrator of Kazan-Samara-Simbirsk, Russian Federation

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Mieczysław Michailas Joudokas
Father Mieczysław Michailas Joudokas (born , died 1938) Apostolic Administrator of Kazan-Samara-Simbirsk

  • a priest for 24.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 29 Aug 2017
  • b: CB, 29 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 30 Nov 2017