Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Jesus Maria Pinto, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lamego


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1763BornPorto
1 Apr 178623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
29 Mar 182158.1SelectedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
24 Sep 182158.6ConfirmedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
23 Dec 182158.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lamego, Portugal
6 Mar 182663.0DiedBishop of Lamego, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José de Jesus Maria Pinto
Bishop José de Jesus Maria Pinto C.R.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Lamego

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 229
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1821, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 May 2016