Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gracija Ivanovic

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1903Born
11 Jul 192623.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
25 Nov 195047.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
1981²77.8CeasedApostolic Administrator of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
20 Aug 198380.5DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gracija Ivanovic
Father Gracija Ivanovic (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Kotor (Cattaro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDobrota
Death PlaceKotor, Diocese of Kotor (Cattaro)

  • a priest for 57.1 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jul 2017