Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerolamo Isopo, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Montemarano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Mar 1528AppointedBishop of Montemarano, Italy
4 Oct 1528Ordained BishopBishop of Montemarano, Italy
1 Dec 1551DiedBishop of Montemarano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo Isopo
Bishop Gerolamo Isopo C.R.L. (died ) Bishop of Montemarano

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 249
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1528, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 15 Jun 2018

Quantcast