Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Isembert (Ivoy), O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Toul, France

Titular Bishop of Christopolis


Events

DateEventTitle
11 May 1450AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Metz, France
11 May 1450AppointedTitular Bishop of Christopolis
14 May 1450Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Christopolis
1461²AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toul, France
8 Sep 1465DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Toul, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Isembert (Ivoy)
Bishop Jean Isembert (Ivoy) O.P. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Toul

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceToul, Diocese of Toul

  • a bishop for 15.3 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,591
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 127, and Page 128
  • ob: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1450, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast