Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Paolo Inurea (Invrea), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ajaccio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1623³BornGenova
1655¹31.1ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
25 Jul 165733.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
26 Jul 165733.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Aug 168662.7AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
10 Mar 169470.3DiedBishop of Ajaccio, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Paolo Inurea (Invrea):
Bishop Giovanni Paolo Inurea (Invrea) O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Ajaccio

  • a priest for 36.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 68
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 22 Apr 2015